+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
On March 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 288 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB958ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Emergency clause deleted
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (39-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N)
- Passed House with amendments (86-Y 11-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Mr. Cantor agreed to
- Read third time
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time
- Failed to pass in House (70-Y 29-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (70-Y 29-N)
- 4/5 votes required for passage
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (26-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg clause 990738743
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (70-Y 29-N)
February 11, 1999: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (26-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1999: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor