+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 745 (effective 7/1/23)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB956ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (83-Y 11-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (83-Y 11-N)
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N)
On March 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB956ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: Passage (85-Y 13-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (85-Y 13-N)
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N)
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
On January 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102223D
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (9)
April 12, 2023: VOTE: Adoption (83-Y 11-N)
April 12, 2023: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N)
February 20, 2023: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
February 16, 2023: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 13-N)
February 10, 2023: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N)
February 9, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2023: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2023: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor