+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 22 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB955ER)
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/01 016005416
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2001: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2001: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor