+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 393 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0393)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB953ER)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104953D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 9, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor