+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (8-Y 8-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (23-Y 17-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18105517D
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
+ − Votes (4)
February 8, 2018: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (8-Y 8-N)
February 6, 2018: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (23-Y 17-N)
February 5, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor