+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in General Laws (14-Y 4-N)
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to LD3233661-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD3233661-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 1-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD3233661-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed LD4592661
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 1995: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws (14-Y 4-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 1-N)
February 3, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor