+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 480 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0480)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB95ER)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106877D-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator Surovell agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB95ES1
- Printed as engrossed 18106877D-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106877D-S1
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101339D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor