+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1160)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1160 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB95ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chair votes Yes
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N)
- Passed House with amendments (58-Y 42-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (13-Y 8-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 20100541D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB95E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
On December 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100541D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2020: House amendments agreed to by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
February 28, 2020: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (13-Y 8-N)
February 18, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
January 29, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Barbara A. Favola
Type:
Primary Sponsor