+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0891)
On March 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 891 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB949ER)
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (28-Y 12-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (28-Y 12-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: (38-Y 59-N)
- Read third time
- Pending question ordered
- Motion to refer to committee rejected (38-Y 59-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Pending question ordered
- Committee substitute agreed to 051880788-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB949H1
- Passed House with substitute (63-Y 35-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N)
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 051880788-H1
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Amendment by Sen. Mims agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed by temporarily
- Committee substitute rejected 050210788-S1
- Amendment by Sen. O'Brien withdrawn
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB949E
- Printed as engrossed 056881788-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (10-Y 3-N)
- Committee substitute printed 050210788-S1
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 056881788
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 24, 2005: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (28-Y 12-N)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: (38-Y 59-N)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N)
February 16, 2005: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (10-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor