+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 30, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495)
On March 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 495 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB945ER)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N)
- Passed House with substitute (86-Y 11-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB945H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053337792-H1
- Read third time
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053337792-H1
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub (18-Y 4-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 056631792
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N)
February 11, 2005: Reported from C. C. T. with sub (18-Y 4-N)
January 24, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2005: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor