+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 304 (effective 7/1/17)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0304)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB944ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB944S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104796D-S1
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 17104796D-S1
On December 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100256D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 15, 2017: House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N)
February 15, 2017: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2017: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor