+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 382 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB943ER)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104423D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor