+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
On March 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 803 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB942ER)
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Amendment by Mr. DeBoer agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 999122718-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 999122718-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 999122718-S1
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 993798718
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor