+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 556 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB941ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 15105020D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB941H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105020D-H1
- Read third time
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 15105020D-H1
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB941E
- Printed as engrossed 15102112D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102112D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 17, 2015: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2015: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor