+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 256 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB938ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Housing
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 090098348
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
January 30, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2009: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor