+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB937E
- Printed as engrossed 18104031D-E
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104031D
- Referred to Committee on Finance