+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N)
- Communicated to Governor
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB934ER)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (51-Y 46-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 9-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB934E
- Printed as engrossed 18104849D-E
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104849D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor