+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 715 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB932ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Passed House (96-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 18104862D
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 21, 2018: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor