+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 693 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB931ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
- Passed House with amendment (98-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Delegate Morris agreed to
- Read third time
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed bill reprinted 15101817D-E
- Printed as engrossed 15101817D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB931E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101817D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2015: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2015: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2015: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor