+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 2010 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Substitute by Delegate Pollard agreed to 10105865D-H1
- Floor substitute printed 10105865D-H1 (Pollard)
- Read third time
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 9-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB93S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104195D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 4-N)
- Committee substitute printed 10104195D-S1
On January 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101099D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2010: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 9-N)
January 21, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
January 19, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor