+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
On March 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 254 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB929ER)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 055221260
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: Reported from Tra. (21-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2005: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor