+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 370 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB927ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Engrossed bill reprinted 077783134-E
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 077783134-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB927E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 077783134