+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 92 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB926ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 2-N)
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Presented and ordered printed 20105421D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2020: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark J. Peake
Type:
Primary Sponsor