+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0967)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 967 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB923ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 20108312D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N)
- Passed House with substitute (72-Y 27-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB923H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108312D-H1
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20108312D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB923S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106761D-S1
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20106761D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed 20104698D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 2020: House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
February 24, 2020: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N)
February 19, 2020: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
February 17, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
February 3, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
L. Louise Lucas
Type:
Primary Sponsor