+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355)
On March 15, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 355 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB921ER)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 975675745
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: Reported from Finance with amd. (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1997: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor