+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 14, 2010 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 10101091D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB92E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101091D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 8, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2010: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor