+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0124)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 124 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB92ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101266D
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2022: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2022: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2022: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor