+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0907)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 907 (effective 7/1/07)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB918ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB918ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment by Delegate Hamilton agreed to
- Read third time
- Passed House with amendment (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Care
On January 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 073102744
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 4, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
April 4, 2007: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2007: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2007: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor