+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 381 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB918ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Delegate Orrock agreed to
- Read third time
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB918S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106731D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18106731D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 18105102D
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2018: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor