+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106952D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB917S1
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18106952D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (7-Y 6-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18105241D
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
February 22, 2018: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
February 9, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Transportation with substitute (7-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor