+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 6, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
On March 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 624 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB914ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 1-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 992460667