+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 369 (effective 7/1/13)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0369)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB913ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 13105059D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105059D-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (91-Y 0-N 3-A)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB913H1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N 3-A)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13105059D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB913S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104876D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13104876D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102070D
+ − Votes (8)
February 21, 2013: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N 3-A)
February 18, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor