+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 739 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB913ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Health
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 20102303D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
January 28, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2020: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jill Holtzman Vogel
Type:
Primary Sponsor