+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 295 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0295)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB908ER)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Amendment by Delegate Bulova agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB908E
- Printed as engrossed 18104936D-E
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104936D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2018: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor