+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 588 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB907ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB907S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 091434333-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 091434333-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 090678333