+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (56)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 766 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB907ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (57-Y 37-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (57-Y 37-N)
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Conference substitute printed 17105797D-S2
- Amended by conference committee
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Delegates: Landes, Lingamfelter, Hester
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senators: Surovell, Saslaw, Peake
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 34-N)
- Passed House with substitute (61-Y 34-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB907H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17105261D-H1
- Read third time
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17105261D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed bill reprinted 17104692D-E2S1
- Printed as reengrossed 17104692D-E2S1
- Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Reengrossed by Senate committee substitute w/amds SB907E2S1
- Amendment by Senator Norment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104692D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB907ES1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Norment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 17104692D-ES1
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 17104692D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On December 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102300D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
February 24, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (57-Y 37-N)
February 24, 2017: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N)
February 17, 2017: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2017: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
February 10, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 34-N)
February 8, 2017: Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
February 1, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
February 1, 2017: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2017: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor