+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 237 (effective 3/9/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB906ER)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (94-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (94-Y 6-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106139D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB906S1
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106139D-S1
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 18104169D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2018: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (94-Y 6-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor