+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0634)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 634 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB906ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: #3 Teachers and Admin. Action
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB906S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104884D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11104884D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102660D
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2011: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor