+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Finance
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (9-Y 6-N)
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100515D
+ − Votes (5)
January 26, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N)
January 26, 2015: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2015: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N)
January 22, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
January 21, 2015: Reported from Finance (9-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor