+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 761 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB904ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 17105645D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 36-N)
- Passed House with substitute (61-Y 36-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB904H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17105645D-H1
- Read third time
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17105645D-H1
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #1
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB904S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104400D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 17104400D-S1
On December 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100985D
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2017: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
February 21, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 36-N)
February 17, 2017: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
January 31, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor