+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 367 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB904ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On January 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101089D
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2013: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2013: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor