+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
On March 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 149 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB902ER)
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 999550629
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 20, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor