+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 53 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB902ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072185804
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 7, 2007: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2007: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor