+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0849)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (48-Y 50-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 50-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (83-Y 13-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (83-Y 13-N 1-A)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 849 (effective 7/1/18)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB902ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB902ER)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (85-Y 14-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House with amendment (84-Y 13-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (84-Y 13-N 1-A)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (18-Y 3-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A)
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105667D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB902S1
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Committee substitute printed 18105667D-S1
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18105004D
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (11)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N)
April 18, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 50-N)
April 18, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (83-Y 13-N 1-A)
March 2, 2018: House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (84-Y 13-N 1-A)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N)
February 26, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (18-Y 3-N)
February 21, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N)
January 29, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A)
January 25, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor