+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Left in Public Safety
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N)
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1
- Referred to Committee on Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB901E
- Printed as engrossed 23103458D-E
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (8-Y 7-N)
On January 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Transportation
- Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 4-N)
On January 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103458D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 9, 2023: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N)
February 1, 2023: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
January 30, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2023: Reported from Transportation with amendments (8-Y 7-N)
January 16, 2023: Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor