+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On March 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
On March 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 499 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB901ER)
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (36-Y 4-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to LD586566-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD586566-S1
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of amendment waived
- Floor amendment agreed to (Houck)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. w/amd LD586566-ES1
- Printed as engrossed LD5865661-ES1
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (29-Y 11-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD5865661-S1
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (8-Y 6-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed LD8601661
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (36-Y 4-N)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: Reported from General Laws with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (29-Y 11-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: Reported from General Laws with sub. (8-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor