+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0554)
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 554 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB900ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Substitute by Delegate Griffith agreed to 075928308-H1
- Read third time
- Floor substitute printed 075928308-H1 (Griffith)
- Pending question ordered
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N)
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB900H1
- Passed House with substitute (93-Y 5-N)
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (29-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (29-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB900E
- Amendments by Senator Stolle agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 073023804-E
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 073023804
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: (29-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 1-N)
February 1, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor