+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 149 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB900ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB900S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104424D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104424D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101637D
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2015: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2015: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor