+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Continued to 2013 in General Laws by voice vote
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104265D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB90S1
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to reconsider reading dispensed agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 12104265D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100911D
+ − Votes (5)
January 19, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2012: Motion to reconsider reading dispensed agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor