+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 499 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB9ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB9S2
- Title replaced 20107320D-S2
- Committee substitute agreed to (28-Y 12-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 20105713D-S1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20107320D-S2
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
On November 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100504D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 2, 2020: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: Committee substitute agreed to (28-Y 12-N)
February 3, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
January 13, 2020: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Richard L. Saslaw
Type:
Primary Sponsor